Accounts and annual returns HILLTOP PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1106476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 May 2019 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 November 2019 294 days late Download Open in new window