Trustees HILLTOP PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1106476

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Harding | Chair | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Nagle | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanpreet Nirwan | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kaylie Corcoran | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abby Squires | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Byrne | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katy Leyshon | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Cowles | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Fairgrieve | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Webb | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Cheal | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Reardon | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.