Financial history LEYTON UNITED FOOTBALL YOUTH COMMUNITY ACADEMY

Charity number: 1109273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £24.39k £10.50k £18.50k £9.99k £17.58k
Total expenditure £24.18k £10.33k £17.93k £9.43k £16.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £9.85k N/A £750