THE COBLE AND KEELBOAT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Members monthly meetings with occassional talks by experts. Newsletters and Journal with articles about inshore fishing craft of N.E and associated topics. Support of heritage and lifeboat days along the coast with display, books about the fishing tradition, models and members craft. Identifying movement of craft and whenever possible rescue and restore .Support research and so on.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Kidd | Chair | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Stoker | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICK SMITH | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.66k | £1.46k | £806 | £889 | £754 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.15k | £766 | £597 | £406 | £860 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
1) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, CONSTRUCTION AND OPERATION OF THE TRADITIONAL WORKING BOATS OF THE COASTAL COMMUNITIES OF NORTHUMBRIA AND IN THE WAYS OF LIFE, WORKING PRACTICES, HERITAGES, CUSTOMS AND SEAGOING TRADITIONS OF THESE COMMUNITIES. 2) TO PRESERVE, RESTORE, MAINTAIN AND DEMONSTRATE THESE TRADITIONAL WORKING BOATS FOR THE BENEFIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
COASTAL COMMUNITIES OF NORTHUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
James Stoker
17, Lansdowne Road
Thornaby
Stockton - on - Tees
TS17 8EU
- Phone:
- 01642 604265
- Email:
- James.N.Stoker@outlook.co
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window