MARMOT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1106619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

There is an emphasis on funding green initiatives that are working towards a sustainable future, and peace and security that are seeking to reduce international conflict including by the eventual elimination of nuclear weapons.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020

Total income: £163,561
Total expenditure: £163,561
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 November 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEAN ELIZABETH BARLOW Chair None on record
JONATHAN NICHOLAS GILLETT Trustee None on record
Martin Bevis Gillett Trustee 18 June 2004 None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £157.19k £95.82k £70.96k £73.82k £163.56k
Total expenditure £116.20k £119.18k £117.59k £85.40k £163.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 19 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 05 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 15 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 15 November 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

Contact information

Address:
C/O THE SECRETARY
BM MARMOT
LONDON
WC1N 3XX
Phone:
07707 996 220
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available