JALALIA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1107914
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 AUGUST 2004, AS AMENDED 10 JANUARY 2005 AND 18 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
IN BANGLADESH: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE IN NEED 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, GENERAL ADVICE HEALTH, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT. 3. TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 02 February 2005 : registered
  • 26 June 2019 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • UK BANGLADESH SHEIKH MOZOM SOCIAL WELFARE AND EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information