CHOOSELIFE CYMRU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve persons who are in need or hardship particularly but not exclusively as a result of alcohol or drug abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 08 November 2004: Standard registration
- CHOOSELIFE UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM GEORGE PETTIFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Laura Jane Bates | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN TOOTILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.65k | £388.06k | £296.18k | £240.10k | £302.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £307.10k | £303.10k | £278.45k | £306.40k | £294.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.06k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £78.28k | £48.63k | £12.06k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP PR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AS A RESULT OF DRUG OR ALCOHOL ABUSE) AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND ACCOMMODATION TO THEIR FAMILIES) IN LLANELLI AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK ; B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN RELATION TO THE AVOIDANCE OF DRUG AND ALCOHOL MISUSE) BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
CARMARTHENSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Antioch Centre
Copperworks Road
Llanelli
SA15 2NE
- Phone:
- 01554 771122
- Email:
- ADMIN@CHOOSELIFEUK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window