THE INTEGRATION CENTRE FOR IVORIANS IN THE UK (ICI)

Charity number: 1108067
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 February 2005: Standard registration
  • 05 May 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not submitted