INTERNATIONAL NETWORK OF CHURCHES-UK (ALSO KNOWN AS COC) LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has continued to provide support, encouragement and guidance to network of churches throughout Europe. a various number of Regional, National and European conferences have been organised in the year also a Bible course has been developed. All key to the objectives of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Algeria
- Bangladesh
- Denmark
- Egypt
- France
- Iceland
- India
- Malta
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- Ukraine
Governance
- 06 December 2004: Standard registration
- 18 April 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- INTERNATIONAL NETWORK OF CHURCHES (OR INC) (Working name)
- CHRISTIAN OUTREACH CENTRE-EUROPE (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.37k | £90.90k | £72.62k | £13.56k | £4.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.29k | £102.02k | £40.44k | £18.99k | £44.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/11/2013
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH WORSHIP, PREACHING AND TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES, FELLOWSHIP, AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF BIBLE TEACHING IN ALL FORMS OF MEDIA, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH GENERALLY. 2. THE INSTRUCTION AND CARE OF CHRISTIANS INCLUDING YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN. 3. THE EVANGELISATION OF NON-CHRISTIANS. 4. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 5. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, POVERTY OR DISTRESS OR AGES OR SICK.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window