THE MARY TOWERTON SCHOOL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides additional funding for extra educational equipment and activities for our school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 22 November 2004: Standard registration
- 19 March 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101 | £375 | £57 | £1.37k | £578 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3 | £145 | £0 | £855 | £438 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE MARY TOWERTON SCHOOL (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE SCHOOL") BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR THE DEPARTMENT FOR EDUCATION AND SKILLS (DFES). IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES MAY UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SCHOOL AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE MARY TOWERTON SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window