HARLESCOTT JUNIOR FUNDRAISERS

Charity number: 1106902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 03 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2016 11 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2016 Not Required