HARLESCOTT JUNIOR FUNDRAISERS

Charity number: 1106902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £5.23k £8.74k £6.15k £4.67k £2.72k
Total expenditure £4.43k £3.56k £5.07k £12.96k £2.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A