Financial history THE PONTARDAWE ARENA

Charity number: 1106812
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £16.05k £79.28k £63.77k £64.20k £90.70k
Total expenditure £17.53k £74.93k £63.10k £63.19k £87.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £29.68k