RSPACE

Charity number: 1107007
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 686 days
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 686 days
Annual return 30 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1051 days
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1051 days
Annual return 30 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1416 days
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1416 days
Annual return 30 August 2015 17 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2014 16 January 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2014 Not Required