Accounts and annual returns THE MARGARET CHATTELL TRUST

Charity number: 1106804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 September 2020 14 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2020 14 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 September 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 September 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2018 08 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 September 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2017 02 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 September 2016 20 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2016 20 October 2016 On time Download Open in new window