Accounts and annual returns SHEFFIELD WEDNESDAY FOOTBALL CLUB COMMUNITY PROGRAMME
Charity number: 1108538

Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 September 2020 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 September 2020 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 27 March 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | 27 March 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window