Financial history SHEFFIELD WEDNESDAY FOOTBALL CLUB COMMUNITY PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1108538
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.70m £1.85m £1.75m £1.67m £1.63m
Total expenditure £1.60m £1.83m £2.07m £1.45m £1.25m
Income from government contracts £47.68k £16.47k £13.85k £559.66k £53.71k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £130.37k £92.90k
Income - Donations and legacies £111.64k £113.16k £136.00k £132.96k £86.19k
Income - Other trading activities £6.57k £4.86k £15.81k £9.89k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.59m £1.73m £782.56k £492.82k £1.45m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £259 £455 £1.02k £181 £503
Income - Other £0 £7.41k £810.36k £1.03m £97.94k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.59m £1.83m £2.07m £1.45m £1.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.82k £12.10k £10.83k £16.61k £11.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.82k £0 £0 £0 £1.39k