Magenta Living

Charity number: 1106969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £62.96m £65.33m £66.30m £69.36m £65.73m
Total expenditure £52.05m £49.81m £57.24m £65.70m £61.99m
Income from government contracts £1.00m £991.00k £361.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £684.00k £1.39m £2.61m £6.07m £6.40m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £470.00k £470.00k £468.00k £552.00k £507.00k
Income - Charitable activities £61.72m £63.18m £63.66m £66.73m £60.54m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £30.00k £25.00k £6.00k £22.00k £0
Income - Other £743.00k £1.65m £2.17m £2.06m £4.68m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £47.27m £45.20m £53.21m £61.23m £61.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £466.00k £16.00k
Expenditure - Governance £149.00k £173.00k £188.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £4.79m £4.38m £4.04m £4.00m £585.00k