Trustees Magenta Living
Charity number: 1106969

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerard Lucas | Chair | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann-Marie Spencer | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Allcock | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lee Riley | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Booker | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas McGrady | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myles Jonathan Edwards | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Liam Garth Christey Kelly | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann-Louise Gilmore | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Turner | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Goodman | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.