FRIENDS OF DELAWARE

Charity number: 1107057
Charity reporting is overdue by 392 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 392 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 392 days
Annual return 31 October 2018 02 January 2020 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 07 November 2017 25 October 2018 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 19 October 2017 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required