Accounts and annual returns SOUTH LONDON FAMILIES REUNITED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1108078
Charity reporting is overdue by 1152 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 56 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 56 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 421 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 421 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 786 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 786 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1152 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1152 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required