THE CAT'S WHISKERS RESCUE

Charity number: 1107910
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 February 2017 On time Download