THE CAT'S WHISKERS RESCUE

Charity number: 1107910
Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £31.34k £32.50k £55.86k £62.00k £51.64k
Total expenditure £36.78k £31.11k £55.04k £57.00k £44.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A