THE CAT'S WHISKERS RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The care and welfare of homeless cats and kittens, and rehousing of animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 02 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MS B A HEARNDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM HAYNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LISA IRENE JACKSON FMAAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.34k | £32.50k | £55.86k | £62.00k | £51.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.78k | £31.11k | £55.04k | £57.00k | £44.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF CATS AND KITTENS WITHIN THE AREAS OF STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE BY REASON OF SICKNESS, STRAYING, NEGLECT OR MALTREATMENT BY THE PROVISION OF A RESCUE, FOSTERING, REHABILITATION AND REHOMING SERVICE, PUBLIC ADVICE AND INFORMATION SERVICE ON ANIMAL WELFARE AND THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF TREATMENT SPAYING OR NEUTERING ACCORDING TO VETERINARY ADVICE OR EXPERTISE.
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 LINCOLN DRIVE
CANNOCK
WS11 8EW
- Phone:
- 01543466850
- Email:
- catswhiskers.mac@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window