ALLERTON BYWATER COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1107132
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 October 2020 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 October 2020 105 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 November 2019 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 November 2019 138 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 April 2019 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 15 November 2019 503 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 10 April 2017 On time Download