Financial history ALL SAINTS SPORTS EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1107190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £200.53k £197.49k £145.65k £153.35k £132.84k
Total expenditure £181.01k £188.33k £145.35k £149.67k £113.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A