ETHIOPIAN EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the educational standards of underprivileged children in Ethiopia and relieving their needs by engaging in charitable initiatives aimed at providing education funding, accommodation and living support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 20 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLEN FORBES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ACHIM KRAM | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Marcio Jose Ramos Sampaio | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.86k | £144.90k | £82.24k | £43.99k | £20.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.45k | £95.08k | £51.11k | £13.97k | £36.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 AUGUST 2004 AMENDED 27 JULY 2006. AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATIONAL STANDARDS OF UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS IN ETHIOPIA AND AFRICA IN GENERAL BY RELIEVING THEIR NEEDS BY ENGAGING IN CHARITABLE INITIATIVES AIMED AT PROVIDING EDUCATION FUNDING, ACCOMMODATION AND LIVING SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
ETHIOPIA AND AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
4A Cavendish Place
BOURNEMOUTH
BH1 1RQ
- Phone:
- 07785 231490
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window