JOHN JACOB ASTOR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Promotion of medical research on terms that the results of such research are published, including (but not restricted to) research into the field of biophysics, research into the causes and treatment of neurological diseases and the study of electro-magnetic fields in living things and the use of such fields in the treatment of disease.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 April 2005: Standard registration
- J J ASTOR CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Adrian Humphreys | Trustee | 20 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA LOUISE DE SAVARY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LISA MARIE DOYNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.04k | £26.38k | £24.57k | £25.30k | £26.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.81k | £32.52k | £33.00k | £1.50k | £133.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 25 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 7 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH ON TERMS THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): (1) RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF BIOPHYSICS (2) RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF NEUROLOGICAL DISEASES (3) THE STUDY OF ELECTRO-MAGNETIC FIELDS IN LIVING THINGS AND THE USE OF SUCH FIELDS IN THE TREATMENT OF DISEASE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACKBROOK GATE
BLACKBROOK PARK AVENUE
TAUNTON
SOMERSET
TA1 2PG
- Phone:
- 03452091269
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window