Financial history ST PETERS CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION(SITTINGBOURNE)

Charity number: 1108396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £4.93k £5.76k £6.14k £1.52k £1.70k
Total expenditure £5.00k £4.25k £4.60k £2.48k £2.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A