Financial history BARNET REFUGEE SERVICE

Charity number: 1107965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £308.83k £464.95k £583.06k £782.31k £895.04k
Total expenditure £304.12k £459.51k £559.96k £760.77k £902.89k
Income from government contracts N/A £122.32k N/A N/A £449.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £23.91k £100.40k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £744.79k £345.52k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £60
Income - Other N/A N/A £583.06k £13.61k £60
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £550.38k £760.77k £894.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £9.58k £11.72k £22.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £8.00k