THE QUILL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scientific & medical research. Educational support. Relief of poverty, sickness and distress. Promotion of Economic Development, Health Care, Education, Social Agricultural Investment and Environmental Engineering, with an emphasis on Local Employment and Ecological Sustainability, focussed on Developing countries, especially in sub Saharah Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Islington
- Israel
- Malawi
- Tanzania
Governance
- 21 December 2004: Standard registration
- QUILL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR R L SHRIER | Chair | 26 November 2004 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Heelan | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANE TORTEMAN | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.59k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £5.11k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.63k | £28 | £4.91k | £6.77k | £3.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1574 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1574 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 NORTHAMPTON SQUARE
LONDON
EC1V 0AJ
- Phone:
- 02072531340
- Email:
- robert@quillfoundation.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window