Trustees THE EDGE MUSICAL PRODUCTION ORGANISATION
Charity number: 1107415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison bisset | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amanda Jane Butler-Smith | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Connor | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Patricia Ashall | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Darling | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
TIFFANY HENRY | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
rob bisset | Trustee | 14 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN DUFFY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISTAIR DAVID DUFFY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ANN MOULTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.