TURNAROUND RESOURCES E1
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES COMPUTER FACILITIES, ADVICE AND ENCOURAGEMENT TO THOSE AT THE LOWEST SOCIAL AND FINANCIAL LEVELS OF SOCIETY TO ENABLE THEM TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF THEIR LIFE AND TO BETTER THEMSELVES ECONOMICALLY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 December 2004: Standard registration
- 24 November 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TURNAROUND E1 (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.30k | £88.95k | £81.86k | £37.46k | £42.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.47k | £65.18k | £76.78k | £67.87k | £56.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 12 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 12 July 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 31 OCTOBER 2003 AND 15 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG HOMELESS, EX-HOMELESS AND OTHER SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DIS-ADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON REGION. 2. TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPACITIES AND SKILLS IN SUCH WAY THAT THEY ARE ABLE IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window