Trustees WELL WOMEN CENTRE

Charity number: 1107523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Mayhew Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Amanda Pauline VICKERS Trustee 06 August 2021
None on record
LEANNE EVANS Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Rachel Ann Massey Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record
Dr Tolu Adedipe Trustee 15 September 2018
None on record
Jane Walton Trustee 09 July 2018
CASTLEFORD HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
RUGBY LEAGUE CARES
Received: On time
JANE BRYANT Trustee
None on record