EBENEZER COMMUNITY LEARNING CENTRE

Charity number: 1108579
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 August 2020 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 August 2020 50 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 July 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 July 2019 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 July 2018 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 July 2018 25 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 11 August 2017 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 August 2017 42 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 22 July 2016 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 22 July 2016 22 days late Download