EBENEZER COMMUNITY LEARNING CENTRE

Charity number: 1108579
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £111.89k £49.51k £108.90k £323.54k £251.69k
Total expenditure £108.92k £59.27k £102.64k £317.47k £265.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £3.24k £78.94k £102.55k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A