EBBW VALE WORKS ARCHIVAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide the public with access to the Industrial Archive relating to iron and at Ebbw Vale during the period 1790 - 2002. Objectives: A Trust Deed was drawn up for the establishment and maintenance of a museum and the collection, preservation and display of the archive. This provides the local community with a unique educational resource and offers great cultural benefit to the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blaenau Gwent
Governance
- 07 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Norman Excell | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARRIE CASWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MELVYN WARRENDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOEL EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.91k | £1.18k | £7.44k | £2.77k | £2.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.29k | £2.57k | £2.87k | £2.11k | £3.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM AND THE COLLECTION , PRESERVATION AND PUBLIC DISPLAY OF THE ARCHIVE. THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EBBW VALE WORKS ARCHIVAL TRUST.
THE GENERAL OFFICE,
STEELWORKS ROAD,
EBBW VALE,
BLAENAU GWENT.
NP23 6AA
- Phone:
- 01495350941
- Email:
- ev_works_at@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window