THE STAFFORDSHIRE BULL TERRIER EXHIBITION GROUP

Charity number: 1110633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 May 2017 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required