WAKEFIELD COLLEGE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1108456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £770 £688 £616 £464 £397
Total expenditure £1.05k £1.20k £1.18k £1.18k £1.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A