Financial history FRONT LINE EMERGENCY EQUIPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1107582
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £146.29k £154.02k £184.91k £165.06k £125.26k
Total expenditure £166.74k £116.94k £181.35k £135.79k £134.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £5.40k