CONFEDERATION OF SCHOOL TRUSTS

Charity number: 1107640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pamela Avril Wright FRSA OBE Trustee 23 September 2016 None on record
ROY BLACKWELL Trustee 22 December 2011 None on record
PAMELA WENDY ANNE TUCKETT Trustee 01 September 2020
YOUTH CENTRE ACTION GROUP (IVYBRIDGE) Received: On time
Mufti Hamid Patel Trustee 01 September 2019
SHINE CHARITY Received: On time
IAN BAUCKHAM Trustee 21 September 2018
SABRE EDUCATION LIMITED Received: On time
Stephen John Snelson Trustee 23 September 2016 None on record
Martyn Ellis Oliver Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
Jacqueline Anne Russell Trustee 01 October 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL & ALL ANGELS, BARNES Received: On time
ROBERT MCDONOUGH Chair 30 July 2013 None on record
Lorrayne Hughes Trustee 11 November 2016 None on record
Luke Dunstan Sparkes Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record