THE UK STEM CELL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1110009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £321.59k £365.84k £80.40k £643.50k £285.25k
Total expenditure £442.84k £839.94k £1.12m £279.87k £344.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £638.96k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £4.55k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £614.98k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £65.68k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £214.19k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £6.15k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A