THE JACK STONEFIELD FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the year funds were raised from sundry donations.. We were also supported by friends and family celebrating important anniversaries, who asked guests to donate to our charity. No grants were made in the year but a grant of £5,000 was made in 2019.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
Governance
- 06 June 2005: Standard registration
- 26 February 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1201654 THE CHRISTIE CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £582 | £557 | £525 | £502 | £601 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £4.70k | £50 | £528 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 5 JUNE 2005,
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF MINORS SUFFERING FROM CANCER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ISRAEL BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS WHICH THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ISRAEL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window