CAMPAIGN AGAINST LIVING MISERABLY

Charity number: 1110621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.27m £1.56m £2.15m £3.71m £5.69m
Total expenditure £1.03m £1.43m £1.87m £2.50m £3.95m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £69.53k £43.91k £34.92k £19.36k £8.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £783.82k £1.21m £2.11m £3.61m £5.64m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £481.10k £355.37k £39.76k £91.95k £49.93k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.71k £1.35k £1.32k £5.28k £3.36k
Income - Other £493 £528 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £7.50k £0 £0 £1.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £905.97k £1.25m £1.54m £2.06m £3.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £119.43k £178.91k £330.77k £434.34k £798.10k
Expenditure - Governance £3.72k £4.92k £4.27k £10.08k £5.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £5.50k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0