CAMPAIGN AGAINST LIVING MISERABLY

Charity number: 1110621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Robert Finch Trustee 27 April 2020 None on record
Will Grundy Trustee 30 September 2019 None on record
ALEXANDER JAMES JONATHAN SCOTT Trustee 27 January 2012 None on record
Philip Idris James Thomas Trustee 27 April 2020 None on record
Catherine Chevallier Trustee 25 November 2019
CORNELIA CAMBRIDGE'S ENDOWMENT FOR ARCHDEACON CAMBRIDGE'S SCHOOL Received: On time
David John Bateson Trustee 27 April 2020
SIR WILLIAM BORLASE BOAT CLUB SUPPORT GROUP Received: On time
Andy Wardlaw Trustee 30 September 2019 None on record
James Richard Scroggs Chair 28 November 2013 None on record
Adam Powers Trustee 30 September 2019 None on record
Emma France Trustee 30 September 2019 None on record
Philip Portal Trustee 14 March 2016 None on record
Marcus Harry Chapman Trustee 16 October 2013 None on record
AIMEE LUTHER Trustee 31 January 2013 None on record