THE NICHOLLS SPINAL INJURY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund research and development into curing spinal cord injury, covering the laboratory, clinical and rehabilitation stages; Advance education by promoting and supporting research into the treatment of spinal injuries and disease, and the publication of the results of such research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Poland
Governance
- 18 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John Sullivan | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hamid Rezan Nejad | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Warren | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Piers Benedict Adam | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Bobby Prasad FRCP MBA | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Storey OBE | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|||||
DAVID NICHOLLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FREDERICK INGLIS WATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £339.04k | £128.21k | £293.35k | £227.96k | £257.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £303.68k | £194.89k | £326.47k | £307.93k | £268.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.54k | £5.54k | £2.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
A. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY FORM OF SPINAL INJURY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE FOR THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SPINAL INJURIES AND DISEASE AND THE PUBLICATION OF RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nicholls Spinal Injury Foundation
27 Old Gloucester Street
London
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 01933 664437
- Email:
- info@nsif.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window