CHARLBURY AND OVERSEAS COMMUNITY PROJECTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charityÔÇÖs object is to provide grants and donations to such charitable purposes as the trustees in their absolute discretion shall think fit. The charityÔÇÖs main activity is that of the distribution of grants and donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 30 June 2005: Standard registration
- CHARLBURY COMMUNITY PROJECTS LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rafael Alarcon-Gaeta | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pete Scott | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean Alan Hosking | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Gill Begnor | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Noble | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bullock | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Peake | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Millea | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD WIGZELL | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.22k | £442 | £7.08k | £17.17k | £19.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.18k | £1.79k | £7.57k | £17.41k | £21.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 24 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 25 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eden House
Two Rivers Industrial Estate
Station Lane
WITNEY
Oxfordshire
OX28 4BL
- Phone:
- +44 7796175917
- Website:
-
charlburybeerfestival.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window