Accounts and annual returns The Battle of the Atlantic Memorial

Charity number: 1109312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 09 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 15 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 09 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required