Financial history The Battle of the Atlantic Memorial

Charity number: 1109312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £136 £24.47k £59.50k £8.30k £7.70k
Total expenditure £988 £11.45k £73.84k £6.78k £2.64k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A