Accounts and annual returns OAKS ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1107998
Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 March 2022 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 March 2022 631 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 October 2019 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required